US HR124 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 216-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) strongly opposes President Trump's ban on transgender members of the Armed Forces, (2) rejects the scientific and medical claims upon which it is based, and (3) strongly urges the Department of Defense to not reinstate the ban and to maintain an inclusive policy allowing qualified transgender Americans to enlist and serve in the Armed Forces.
Title
Expressing opposition to banning service in the Armed Forces by openly transgender individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 135 (Y: 238 N: 185 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-28 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 185, 1 Present (Roll no. 135). (text: CR H2891) |
2019-03-28 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-03-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 124. |
2019-03-28 | House | The resolution provides for one hour debate on H.R. 7 and H.Res. 124. |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 252. (consideration: CR H2891-2899) |
2019-03-27 | House | Rule H. Res. 252 passed House. |
2019-03-25 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 252 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour debate on H.R. 7 and H.Res. 124. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR252 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Military personnel and dependents
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Military personnel and dependents
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination