US HR127 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the importance of the U.S.-Japan and U.S.-South Korea alliances in promoting peace, stability, and security in the Indo-Pacific region, and reaffirms the U.S. commitment to defend both Japan and South Korea. It also states the importance of deepening diplomatic and security cooperation between the three countries.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on the importance and vitality of the United States alliances with Japan and the Republic of Korea, and our trilateral cooperation in the pursuit of shared interests.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7885-7886) |
2019-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 127. |
2019-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7885-7886) |
2019-09-24 | House | Mr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR67 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2395-2397; text: CR S2396-2397)
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Japan
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Sanctions
South Korea
United Nations
Women's rights
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Japan
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Sanctions
South Korea
United Nations
Women's rights