US HR129 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning the Government of Saudi Arabia's continued detention and alleged abuse of women's rights activists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the Government of Saudi Arabia's continued detention and alleged abuse of women's rights activists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5800-5801)
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 129.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5800-5802)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-13HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E301)
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback