US HR131 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of the conference report on H.J.Res. 31 (FY2019 Department of Homeland Security appropriations).
Title
Providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 31) making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from February 15, 2019, through February 22, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 86 (Y: 230 N: 196 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 85 (Y: 229 N: 195 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 85 (Y: 229 N: 195 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 196 (Roll no. 86). (text: CR H2008) |
2019-02-14 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 195 (Roll no. 85). (consideration: CR H2015-2016) |
2019-02-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 131. |
2019-02-14 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2008-2016) |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 8. |
2019-02-14 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-10, by Mr. Perlmutter. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)