US HR156 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns Russian President Vladimir Putin and his regime for targeting political opponents and attempting to cover up the assassination of Russian opposition leader and democracy advocate Boris Nemtsov. It also calls on the Department of State to impose sanctions on those involved and to report to Congress on the assassination.
Title
Calling for accountability and justice for the assassination of Boris Nemtsov.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 121 (Y: 416 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 1 (Roll no. 121). (text: CR H2657-2658) |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2673-2674) |
2019-03-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 156. |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2657-2660) |
2019-03-12 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,. |
2019-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR81 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3294-3296; text: CR S3295-3296)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime
Visas and passports