US HR157 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
Pending: House Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
Pending: House Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution prohibits Members, Delegates, or the Resident Commissioner of the House from serving on the boards of for-profit entities.
Title
Restoring Integrity in Democracy Resolution
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ethics. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/157/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres157/BILLS-116hres157ih.pdf |