US HR172 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 1 (For the People Act of 2019). The resolution makes it in order at any time on the legislative day of March 7, 2019, or March 8, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1) to expand Americans' access to the ballot box, reduce the influence of big money in politics, and strengthen ethics rules for public servants, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 107 (Y: 232 N: 192 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 106 (Y: 232 N: 191 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 106 (Y: 232 N: 191 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-06 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 192 (Roll no. 107). (text: CR H2379-2380) |
2019-03-06 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 191 (Roll no. 106). (consideration: CR H2387-2388) |
2019-03-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 172. |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2379-2388) |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 11. |
2019-03-05 | House | The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 116-7, modified by the amendment printed in Part A of the resolution is considered as adopted. The resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of March 8, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2019-03-05 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-16, by Ms. Scanlon. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.