US HR189 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-53)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for increased U.S. efforts to combat malnutrition among women and children and acknowledges the contributions of the U.S. Agency for International Development in addressing global nutritional needs.
Title
Recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting United States Agency for International Development's commitment to global nutrition through its multi-sectoral nutrition strategy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6869-6870) |
2020-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 189. |
2020-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6869-6872) |
2020-12-07 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-03-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Discharged. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR260 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198-199)
Subjects
Child health
Food assistance and relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nutrition and diet
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Women's health
World health
Food assistance and relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nutrition and diet
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Women's health
World health