US HR205 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes National Travel and Tourism Week.
Title
Recognizing the goals of National Travel and Tourism Week and honoring the valuable contributions of travel and tourism to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SR141 (Related) 2013-05-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3436; text as passed Senate: CR S3434)
SR443 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2980; text as passed Senate: CR S2957-2958)
SR443 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2980; text as passed Senate: CR S2957-2958)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Transportation and public works
Travel and tourism
Congressional tributes
Transportation and public works
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres205/BILLS-113hres205ih.pdf |