US HR232 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1911) to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to establish interest rates for new loans made on or after July 1, 2013.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1911) to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to establish interest rates for new loans made on or after July 1, 2013, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 224 N: 193 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 224 N: 195 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 224 N: 195 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-05-23 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 193 (Roll no. 181). (text: CR H2917) |
2013-05-23 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 195 (Roll no. 180). (consideration: CR H2925-2926) |
2013-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 232. |
2013-05-23 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2917-2926) |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 28. |
2013-05-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1911 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-89, by Ms. Foxx. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1911 (Related) 2013-08-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-28.