US HR232 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing linemen, the profession of linemen, the contributions of these brave men and women who protect public safety, and expressing support for the designation of April 18, 2017, as National Lineman Appreciation Day. Recognizes the efforts of linemen in keeping the electrical power on and protecting public safety. Expresses support for the designation of National Lineman Appreciation Day.
Title
Recognizing linemen, the profession of linemen, the contributions of these brave men and women who protect public safety, and expressing support for the designation of April 18, 2017, as National Lineman Appreciation Day.
Sponsors
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR10 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR832 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR832 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Electric power generation and transmission
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health
Congressional tributes
Electric power generation and transmission
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/232/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres232/BILLS-115hres232ih.pdf |