US HR245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the levels of payment for 116th Congress expenses (including staff salaries) for the following House Committees: (1) Agriculture; (2) Armed Services; (3) the Budget; (4) Select Committee on the Climate Crisis; (5) Education and Labor; (6) Energy and Commerce; (7) Ethics; (8) Financial Services; (9) Foreign Affairs; (10) Homeland Security; (11) House Administration; (12) Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence; (13) the Judiciary; (14) Select Committee on the Modernization of Congress; (15) Natural Resources; (16) Oversight and Reform; (17) Rules; (18) Science, Space, and Technology; (19) Small Business; (20) Transportation and Infrastructure; (21) Veterans' Affairs; and (22) Ways and Means. Among other things, this resolution (1) prescribes limitations to such expenses for the 1st and 2nd sessions of the 116th Congress, and (2) establishes a reserve fund for unanticipated committee expenses for the 116th Congress.
Title
Providing for the expenses of certain committees of the House of Representatives in the One Hundred Sixteenth Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-27 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2875-2876) |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2875-2876) |
2019-03-27 | House | Ms. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 14. |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 116-20. |
2019-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congress
Congressional committees
House Committee on Agriculture
House Committee on Armed Services
House Committee on Education and Labor
House Committee on Energy and Commerce
House Committee on Ethics
House Committee on Financial Services
House Committee on Foreign Affairs
House Committee on Homeland Security
House Committee on House Administration
House Committee on Natural Resources
House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
House Committee on Rules
House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
House Committee on Small Business
House Committee on the Budget
House Committee on the Judiciary
House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
House Committee on Veterans' Affairs
House Committee on Ways and Means
House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Congressional committees
House Committee on Agriculture
House Committee on Armed Services
House Committee on Education and Labor
House Committee on Energy and Commerce
House Committee on Ethics
House Committee on Financial Services
House Committee on Foreign Affairs
House Committee on Homeland Security
House Committee on House Administration
House Committee on Natural Resources
House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
House Committee on Rules
House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
House Committee on Small Business
House Committee on the Budget
House Committee on the Judiciary
House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
House Committee on Veterans' Affairs
House Committee on Ways and Means
House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence