US HR269 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of March 2, 2020, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Day". This resolution supports the designation of Gold Star Families Remembrance Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of March 2, 2020, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Day".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR93 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1663; text: CR S1661)
HR39 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback