US HR271 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 104-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning the Trump Administration's Legal Campaign to Take Away Americans' Health Care. This resolution urges the Department of Justice (DOJ) to cease its efforts against the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and reverse its position in Texas v. United States. (On March 25, 2019, DOJ submitted a letter to the appellate court agreeing with the lower court's decision that PPACA should be struck in its entirety).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the Trump Administration's Legal Campaign to Take Away Americans' Health Care.

Sponsors

Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]

Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 146 (Y: 240 N: 186 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-03HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 186, 1 Present (Roll no. 146). (text: CR 4/2/2019 H2956-2957)
2019-04-03HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3002-3003)
2019-04-02HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-04-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 271.
2019-04-02HouseRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
2019-04-02HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 274. (consideration: CR H2956-2969)
2019-04-02HouseRule H. Res. 274 passed House.
2019-04-01HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 274 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR274 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR134 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2192-2193)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback