US HR273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reaffirming the United States commitment to Taiwan and to the implementation of the Taiwan Relations Act. This resolution affirms that the Taiwan Relations Act and the Six Assurances will remain cornerstones of the U.S.-Taiwan relationship. It encourages increasing engagement between the United States and Taiwan and states that the President should conduct regular transfers of defense articles to Taiwan. (The United States made the Six Assurances to Taiwan in 1982, stating that it will not pressure Taiwan to negotiate with China and that it has not agreed to consult with China prior to any arms sales to Taiwan.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reaffirming the United States commitment to Taiwan and to the implementation of the Taiwan Relations Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution RC# 185 (Y: 414 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-07HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 185). (text: CR H3457)
2019-05-07HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3461)
2019-05-07HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-05-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 273.
2019-05-07HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3457-3458)
2019-05-07HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SCR13 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback