US HR294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 1644 (Save the Internet Act of 2019) and for H.B. 2021 (Investing for the People Act of 2019), (2) adopts H.Res. 293 (enforcing the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 for FY2020), and (3) provides for specified congressional procedures on any legislative day from April 11, 2019, through April 26, 2019.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1644) to restore the open internet order of the Federal Communications Commission; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2021) to amend the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 and to establish a congressional budget for fiscal year 2020; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 161 (Y: 219 N: 201 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 160 (Y: 225 N: 192 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 160 (Y: 225 N: 192 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-09 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 201 (Roll no. 161). (text: CR H3141) |
2019-04-09 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 192 (Roll no. 160). (consideration: CR H3166-3167) |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3166-3168) |
2019-04-09 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 294, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question, and announced by voice vote, that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Morelle demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2019-04-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 294. |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3141-3148) |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 20. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit is allowed for both measures. The rule provides for adoption of H.Res. 293. The rule provides for proceedings during the period of April 11, 2019, through April 26, 2019. |
2019-04-08 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-37, by Mr. Morelle. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1644 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74.
HR294 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2021 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Rule H. Res. 294 passed House.
HR293 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 294, H. Res. 293 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H3185-3186; text: CR H3185-3186)
HR294 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2021 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Rule H. Res. 294 passed House.
HR293 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 294, H. Res. 293 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H3185-3186; text: CR H3185-3186)