US HR311 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing that for 50 years the Association of South East Asian Nations (ASEAN) has worked toward stability, prosperity, and peace in Southeast Asia. Supports: (1) the elevation of the U.S.-Association of South East Asian Nations (ASEAN) relationship to a strategic partnership; (2) cooperation with ASEAN to implement practical counter-terrorism and countering violent extremism measures; and (3) efforts by ASEAN member states and other regional states to address maritime and territorial disputes in a constructive manner and to pursue claims through diplomacy and the use of legitimate regional and international arbitration mechanisms. Recognizes the value of ASEAN working with economic, political, and security partners to strengthen existing initiatives and develop new initiatives that address mutual strategic concerns. Encourages enhancement of economic engagement between the United States and ASEAN through the elimination of trade barriers. Urges all parties to maritime and territorial disputes in the Asia-Pacific region to: (1) exercise self-restraint in the conduct of activities that would undermine stability or escalate disputes through the use of coercion, intimidation, or military force; and (2) refrain from efforts to militarize uninhabited islands, reefs, shoals, and other features. Reaffirms the U.S. commitment to: (1) promoting a rules-based order in the Asia-Pacific and economic growth, peace, human rights and stability in Southeast Asia; and (2) continuing joint efforts with ASEAN to halt human trafficking.
Title
Recognizing that for 50 years the Association of South East Asian Nations (ASEAN) has worked toward stability, prosperity, and peace in Southeast Asia.
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 540 (Y: 413 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-27 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR 9/25/2017 H7444) |
2017-09-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7552-7553) |
2017-09-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 311. |
2017-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7444-7446) |
2017-09-25 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-06-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR157 (Related) 2017-05-04 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2778-2780)
Subjects
Asia
Brunei
Burma
Cambodia
China
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
Indonesia
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Laos
Malaysia
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Philippines
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Singapore
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Thailand
Transportation safety and security
United Nations
Vietnam
Brunei
Burma
Cambodia
China
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
Indonesia
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Laos
Malaysia
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Philippines
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Singapore
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Thailand
Transportation safety and security
United Nations
Vietnam