US HR315 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Donate Life Month and for promoting awareness of organ and tissue donation.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of April 2019 as "National Donate Life Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-12 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E462-463) |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR162 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/11/2019 S2441)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/315/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres315/BILLS-116hres315ih.pdf |