US HR318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) supports the designation of National Assistant Principals Week, and (2) honors the contributions of assistant principals to the success of students in the United States.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 8 through April 12, 2019, as National Assistant Principals Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR149 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333)
HR914 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR914 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres318/BILLS-116hres318ih.pdf |