US HR339 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Senior Fraud Awareness Day and encourages the implementation of policies that prevent such fraud and improve protections for seniors.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 15, 2019, as "National Senior Fraud Awareness Day" to raise awareness about the barrage of fraud attempts that seniors face, to encourage the implementation of policies to prevent these scams from happening, and to improve protections from these scams for seniors.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR210 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2837; text: CR S2836)
SR590 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559; text: CR S2555)
SR590 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559; text: CR S2555)
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internet and video services
Postal service
Telephone and wireless communication
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internet and video services
Postal service
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/339/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres339/BILLS-116hres339ih.pdf |