US HR347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) celebrates the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every U.S. community, and (2) supports the designation of National Small Business Week.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 5, 2019, through May 11, 2019, as "National Small Business Week" to celebrate the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every community in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR360 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR1134 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR1134 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/347/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres347/BILLS-116hres347ih.pdf |