US HR349 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the vital role of the U.S.-Japan alliance in promoting peace and stability and calls for further strengthening of ties.
Title
Reaffirming the vital role of the United States-Japan alliance in promoting peace, stability, and prosperity in the Indo-Pacific region and beyond.
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5882) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 349. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5882-5883) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR183 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256)
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Japan
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Japan