US HR360 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Small Business Week and efforts to encourage consumers to shop locally. It also supports and encourages young entrepreneurs to pursue their passions and create more startup businesses.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 5, 2019, through May 11, 2019, as "National Small Business Week" to honor the vital role of small business and the passion of entrepreneurs in the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR347 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
Small Business Administration
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
Small Business Administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/360/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres360/BILLS-116hres360ih.pdf |