US HR364 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns the attack on the Chabad of Poway Synagogue near San Diego, California, on April 27, 2019. It honors the memory of Lori Gilbert Kaye, who was killed. It expresses hope for recovery of the three individuals who were injured.
Title
Condemning the horrific anti-Semitic attack on the Chabad of Poway Synagogue near San Diego, California, on April 27, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR231 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 6/5/2019 S3261)
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Hate crimes
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Violent crime
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Hate crimes
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/364/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres364/BILLS-116hres364ih.pdf |