US HR389 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 1500 ( Consumers First Act) and H.B. 1994 (Setting Every Community Up for Retirement Enhancement Act of 2019). Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from May 24, 2019, through May 31, 2019. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of May 23, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules, relating to a measure making supplemental appropriations for FY2019. The resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through such legislative day, on the same day it is presented to the House, relating to such measure. The House Committee on Appropriations may, at any time before 5:00 p.m. on Sunday, June 2, 2019, file privileged reports to accompany measures making appropriations for FY2020.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1500) to require the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau to meet its statutory purpose, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1994) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage retirement savings, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 24, 2019, through May 31, 2019; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 221 (Y: 230 N: 190 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 220 (Y: 227 N: 191 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 220 (Y: 227 N: 191 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 190 (Roll no. 221). (text: CR H4024-4025) |
2019-05-21 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 191 (Roll no. 220). (consideration: CR H4030) |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4030-4031) |
2019-05-21 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 389, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 389. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4024-4030) |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 24. |
2019-05-20 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 1500, under a structured rule, and provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 1994, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from May 24, 2019, through May 31, 2019, and provides for motions to suspend the rules on the legislative day of May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-20 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-79, by Mr. Perlmutter. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1500 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR389 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1994 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Received in the Senate.
HR389 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1994 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Received in the Senate.