US HR410 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution calls on the United States and North Korea to reunited Korean-American divided family members with their immediate relatives as a humanitarian policy of immediate concern.
Title
Encouraging reunions of divided Korean-American families.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 91 (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 91). (text: CR H1545) |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1548-1549) |
2020-03-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 410. |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1545-1546) |
2020-03-09 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
Human rights
International affairs
North Korea
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Family relationships
Human rights
International affairs
North Korea