US HR416 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the sovereignty and territorial integrity of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania, and expresses concerns over Russia's increasingly aggressive military maneuvering near their borders and airspace. The resolution encourages the United States to further enhance defense cooperation efforts with these countries.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on support for Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Alliances
Collective security
Estonia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Latvia
Lithuania
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Collective security
Estonia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Latvia
Lithuania
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres416/BILLS-116hres416ih.pdf |