US HR432 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-8)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning the attacks on peaceful protesters and supporting an immediate peaceful transition to a civilian-led democratic government in Sudan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the attacks on peaceful protesters and supporting an immediate peaceful transition to a civilian-led democratic government in Sudan.

Sponsors

Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]

Roll Calls

2019-07-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 476 (Y: 414 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 476). (text: CR H5789-5790)
2019-07-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5813-5814)
2019-07-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 432.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5789-5793)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-12HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4440-4441)
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-06-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback