US HR448 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of Juneteenth Independence Day to commemorate the end of slavery in the United States.
Title
Expressing support for designation of June 19, 2019, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR253 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3836; text: CR S3850)
HR450 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1001 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR620 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)
HR450 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1001 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR620 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/448/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres448/BILLS-116hres448ih.pdf |