US HR451 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution honors the achievements of the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944 in democratizing higher education and affirms Congress's responsibility to ensure that veterans' educational assistance endures as an honorable investment of public dollars.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of June 16 through June 23, 2019, as National GI Bill Commemoration Week and Celebrating the 75th Anniversary of the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944.
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR256 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text: CR S4177-4178)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/451/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres451/BILLS-116hres451ih.pdf |