US HR458 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends the people of Tunisia for their commitment to democracy, the rule of law, and free elections, and encourages Tunisia's political leaders to work together to accelerate economic reforms and anti-corruption measures. It also calls on the government to fully implement the Tunisian Constitution of 2014, which includes protections for civil liberties and the establishment of the Constitutional Court.
Title
Reaffirming the strong partnership between Tunisia and the United States and supporting the people of Tunisia in their continued pursuit of democratic reforms.
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR236 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 6/5/2019 CR S3264)
Subjects
Africa
Area studies and international education
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Tunisia
Area studies and international education
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Tunisia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres458/BILLS-116hres458ih.pdf |