US HR498 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of School Social Work Week. Honors the contributions of school social workers to the success of students in schools.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of March 2, 2014, through March 8, 2014, as "School Social Work Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR96 (Same As) 2013-03-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/498/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres498/BILLS-113hres498ih.pdf |