US HR512 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-15)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 3, 1 Present (Roll no. 236). (text: CR H6865)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 3, 1 Present (Roll no. 236). (text: CR H6865)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution calls on the President and the Department of State to (1) make the repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws a priority in bilateral relationships between the United States and countries that have such laws; (2) designate countries that enforce such laws as countries of particular concern for religious freedom; and (3) oppose efforts by the United Nations to implement an international anti-blasphemy norm. The resolution also calls on the governments of countries that enforce such laws to amend or repeal them and to release anyone imprisoned pursuant to them.
Title
Calling for the global repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended (Y: 386 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 3, 1 Present (Roll no. 236). (text: CR H6865) |
2020-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6883) |
2020-12-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 512. |
2020-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6864-6867) |
2020-12-07 | House | Mr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR458 (Same As) 2020-12-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7851-7852)
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
United Nations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
United Nations