US HR517 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the University of Washington women's softball team for winning the 2009 Women's College World Series.
Title
Congratulating the University of Washington women's softball team for winning the 2009 Women's College World Series.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Abercrombie [D-HI] | Rep. Brian Baird [D-WA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Norman Dicks [D-WA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] |
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Jay Inslee [D-WA] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Mark Souder [R-IN] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-01 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-01 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 747). (text: CR 9/30/2009 H10080) | |
2009-10-01 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10418-10419) | |
2009-09-30 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-09-30 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 517. | |
2009-09-30 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10080-10082) | |
2009-09-30 | Ms. Chu moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-07-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness. | |
2009-06-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SR168 (Related) 2009-06-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6215)