US HR521 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends Canada for upholding the rule of law and complying with its obligations under its extradition treaty with the United States, in connection with Canada's arrest Meng Wanzhou, chief financial officer of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. It also expresses the Senate's concern over China's arbitrary and abusive treatment of Canadian nationals in response to Meng's detention, and calls for the immediate release of those individuals. (The United States requested the arrest of Meng, who stands accused of various crimes under U.S. law.)
Title
Commending the Government of Canada for upholding the rule of law and expressing concern over actions by the Government of the People's Republic of China in response to a request from the United States Government to the Government of Canada for the extradition of a Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., executive.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8128) |
2019-10-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 521. |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8128-8129) |
2019-10-15 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR96 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2701; text: CR 3/6/2019 S1710)
Subjects
Asia
Canada
China
Corporate finance and management
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International law and treaties
Rule of law and government transparency
Canada
China
Corporate finance and management
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International law and treaties
Rule of law and government transparency