US HR571 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Voter Registration Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 24, 2019, as "National Voter Registration Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR353 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756)
SR719 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR719 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/571/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres571/BILLS-116hres571ih.pdf |