US HR575 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that (1) all stakeholders in the deployment of fifth-generation (5G) communications infrastructure should consider adherence to the Prague Proposals (wireless technology recommendations from the Prague 5G Security Conference) in procuring products and services, and (2) the President and federal agencies should promote global trade and security policies consistent with the Prague Proposals and urge our allies to embrace the proposals for their 5G infrastructure.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that all stakeholders in the deployment of 5G communications infrastructure should carefully consider and adhere to the recommendations of "The Prague Proposals".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H41) |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 575. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H41-43) |
2020-01-08 | House | Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-01-07 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 67. |
2020-01-07 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2020-01-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-368, Part I. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication