US HR61 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 648) making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 31) making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules. This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 648 (Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019) and H.J.Res. 31 (FY2019 Department of Homeland Security appropriations). The resolution makes it in order at any time through the legislative day of February 1, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules. In addition, the resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through the legislative day of January 30, 2019, on the same day it is presented to the House, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for FY2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 648) making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 31) making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 47 (Y: 223 N: 190 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-23HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 190 (Roll no. 47). (text: CR H1012-1013)
2019-01-23HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1023)
2019-01-23HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 61, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption until a time to be announced.
2019-01-23HouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
2019-01-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 61.
2019-01-23HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1012-1022)
2019-01-22HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
2019-01-22HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
2019-01-22HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-4, by Mr. Morelle.

Same As/Similar To

HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HR61 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback