US HR614 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) encourages the recognition of Smart Cities Week; and (2) expresses support for efforts to further research and develop and adopt technology in American cities designed to improve efficiency, connectivity, sustainability, and mobility in transportation and infrastructure and increase awareness of new workforce opportunities.
Title
Expressing support for the recognition of October 7, 2019, through October 11, 2019, as "Smart Cities Week" and supporting the further research, development, and adoption of technology designed to improve efficiency, connectivity, sustainability, and mobility in transportation, infrastructure, and workforce opportunity in American cities and communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Industrial policy and productivity
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Industrial policy and productivity
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/614/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres614/BILLS-116hres614ih.pdf |