US HR616 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2874) to achieve reforms to improve the financial stability of the National Flood Insurance Program, to enhance the development of more accurate estimates of flood risk through new technology and better maps, to increase the role of private markets in the management of flood insurance risks, and to provide for alternative methods to insure against flood peril, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2810) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2018 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2874) to achieve reforms to improve the financial stability of the National Flood Insurance Program, to enhance the development of more accurate estimates of flood risk through new technology and better maps, to increase the role of private markets in the management of flood insurance risks, and to provide for alternative methods to insure against flood peril, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2810) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2018 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2874) to achieve reforms to improve the financial stability of the National Flood Insurance Program, to enhance the development of more accurate estimates of flood risk through new technology and better maps, to increase the role of private markets in the management of flood insurance risks, and to provide for alternative methods to insure against flood peril, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2810) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2018 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 626 (Y: 234 N: 189 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 627 (Y: 233 N: 187 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-14HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 187 (Roll no. 627). (text: CR H9191)
2017-11-14HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 189 (Roll no. 626).
2017-11-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 616.
2017-11-14HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H9191-9199)
2017-11-13HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
2017-11-13HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of general debate and closed rule for H.R. 2874. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of the conference report to accompany H.R. 2810.
2017-11-13HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-408, by Mr. Byrne.

Same As/Similar To

HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback