US HR618 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the Czech Republic and the Slovak Republic for their achievements in building prosperous, democratic societies since the dissolution of Czechoslovakia. The resolution also commends the countries for their support of NATO (North Atlantic Treaty Organization) operations in Afghanistan and reaffirms the United States' commitment to a free and peaceful Europe.
Title
Congratulating the peoples of the Czech Republic and the Slovak Republic on the 30th anniversary of the Velvet Revolution, on the 26th anniversary of their countries' independence, and on the 101st anniversary of Czechoslovakia's declaration of independence.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment. |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-10-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR343 (Related) 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S76; text: CR 9/26/2019 S5752)
Subjects
Afghanistan
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Czech Republic
Europe
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Political movements and philosophies
Slovakia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Czech Republic
Europe
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Political movements and philosophies
Slovakia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/618/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres618/BILLS-116hres618ih.pdf |