US HR663 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8942)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8942)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of BatWeek and acknowledges the important role bats play as pollinators and pest control for agriculture.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of October 24, 2019, to October 31, 2019, as "BatWeek".
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8942) |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2019-10-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres663/BILLS-116hres663ih.pdf |