US HR680 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikhs of the United States and expresses respect for all Sikhs who practice their faith. The resolution also recognizes the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Guru Nanak's 550th birthday. Additionally, the resolution recognizes the discrimination Sikhs of the United States have faced.
Title
Recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of the 550th birthday of Guru Nanak and the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikhs of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR538 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR393 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
SR393 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/680/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres680/BILLS-116hres680ih.pdf |