US HR697 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes both the cultural and religious significance of an autonomous Tibet. The resolution also calls on the United States to increase support for Tibet in a number of areas, including the succession of the Dalai Lama and environmental policy.
Title
Recognizing the significance of the genuine autonomy of Tibet and the Tibetan people and the work His Holiness the 14th Dalai Lama has done to promote global peace, harmony, and understanding.
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5878-5879) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 697. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5878-5880) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Discharged. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
House of Representatives
Human rights
International affairs
Members of Congress
Protest and dissent
Religion
Senate
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tibet
U.S. Capitol
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
House of Representatives
Human rights
International affairs
Members of Congress
Protest and dissent
Religion
Senate
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tibet
U.S. Capitol