US HR792 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the historical significance of Roberto Clemente's place of death near Piñones in Loíza, Puerto Rico, by adding it to the National Register of Historic Places.
Title
Urging the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the historical significance of Roberto Clemente's place of death near Piñones in Loíza, Puerto Rico, by adding it to the National Register of Historic Places.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 426 (Y: 385 N: 1 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 1, 2 Present (Roll no. 426). (text: CR H9781) |
2018-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9802-9803) |
2018-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 792. |
2018-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9781-9782) |
2018-12-10 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2018-10-12 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 189. |
2018-10-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-988. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-27 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |