US HR809 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the importance of the U.S.-Korea alliance in promoting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region and calls for further strengthening ties between the countries.
Title
Expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5883) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 809. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5883-5884) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR301 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR152 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80)
SR152 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80)
Subjects
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea