US HR823 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-34)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution condemns Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of human rights agreements. Further, it calls on Iran to immediately release all imprisoned or detained Baha'is, and it urges the President and the Department of State to impose sanctions on Iranian officials and others who are responsible for serious human rights abuses, including abuses against Iran's Baha'i community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.

Sponsors

Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-07HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2020-12-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-12-07HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6867-6868)
2020-12-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 823.
2020-12-07HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6867-6869)
2020-12-07HouseMr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2020-10-01HouseSubcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism Discharged.
2020-10-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-10-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism.
2020-01-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR578 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2455-2456)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback