US HR899 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution encourages (1) the people of the United States to join in a national effort to salute AmeriCorps members and alumni and to raise awareness about the importance of national and community service, and (2) all individuals to consider opportunities to serve in AmeriCorps. The resolution also acknowledges the accomplishments of AmeriCorps members, alumni, and community partners, and recognizes their important contributions to the lives of the people of the United States.
Title
Recognizing the contributions of AmeriCorps members and alumni to the lives of the people of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR227 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR127 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
SR540 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
SR127 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
SR540 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/899/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres899/BILLS-116hres899ih.pdf |