US HR914 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 97-15)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster care system. Expresses support for the designation of National Foster Care Month.
Title
Recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster care system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR314 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
SR156 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR513 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733; text: CR S2728-2729)
SR156 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR513 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733; text: CR S2728-2729)
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/914/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres914/BILLS-115hres914ih.pdf |