US HR914 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) supports the designation of National Assistant Principals Week, and (2) honors the contributions of assistant principals to the success of students in the United States.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 6 through April 10, 2020, as National Assistant Principals Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR318 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR149 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333)
SR149 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/914/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres914/BILLS-116hres914ih.pdf |